DE HB265 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act reinstates Delaware’s estate tax. Prior to 2002, the Internal Revenue Code allowed states to effectively share estate tax revenue with the federal government. From 2002 to 2005, the states’ share of this arrangement was phased-out. Under this Act, Delaware’s estate tax will be calculated using the rate schedule for state tax credits available under federal law in 2001. This Act recognizes other updates to federal estate tax law that have occurred since 2001.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Estate Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Thurman Adams [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Sen. Nancy Cook [D] | Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | Stricken | |
2009-06-25 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-23 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |