DE HB264 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act represents one of the recommendations of the Local Service Functions Task Force created by House Concurrent Resolution No. 54. This Act revises the process by which the New Castle County tax rate for owners of real property in municipalities is calculated to reflect fire company contributions made by the municipality. This process does not consider as an in-kind contribution from New Castle County or a municipality the property tax that a fire company does not pay because real property owned by fire companies is exempt from taxation. Because no property tax is due, it is not an amount that either New Castle County or a municipality is waiving.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To New Castle County Property Tax Rates And Municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20 Signed by Governor
2020-01-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-01-22 Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2020-01-16 Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2020-01-16 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-15 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2020-01-09 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback