DE HB264 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This charter amendment consolidates the authority of the Town of Wyoming to regulate nuisances into one location within the charter and clarifies the Town’s authority to regulate nuisances. This charter amendment raises the taxation limit of the Town from $600,000 to $1,500,000.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Wyoming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |