DE HB264 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill gives students with individualized education plans until the age of 21 to complete their driver education certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To General Regulatory Provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-19 Signed by Governor
2012-04-05 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-04-04 Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2012-03-28 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2012-03-22 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-03-22 Amendment HA 2 - Laid On Table in House
2012-03-22 Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2012-03-21 Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2012-03-21 Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2012-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2012-03-08 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback