DE HB264 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-30 - HS 1 for HB 264 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-30 - HS 1 for HB 264 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act will increase the personal income tax rates from 5.55% to 5.95% on taxable income ranging from $50,000 to $60,000; from 5.95% to 6.95% on taxable income ranging from $60,000 to $150,000; and from 5.95% to 7.45% on taxable income in excess of $150,000.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes On Personal Income.
Sponsors
Sen. Thurman Adams [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Sen. Nancy Cook [D] | Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment SA 3 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 25 YES 15 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 5 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 5 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 4 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 4 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 3 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Lifted From Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 1 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 264 - Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-25 | Amendment HA 4 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-25 | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-23 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |