DE HB262 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill provides that employees serving in security-related or high-risk positions may be eligible for hazardous duty pay. Those positions would be designated by the Chief Justice in accord with the needs of each court. Funding for this additional pay would come from the Court Security Fund, established by 10 Del. C. 8505.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Hazardous Duty Pay.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Stricken | |
2012-03-15 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2012-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |