DE HB260 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill creates the Grant-In-Aid Committee. The Committee is a joint committee of the Senate and House of Representatives. The purpose of the Committee is to review requests for grant-in-aid and to develop the grant-in-aid appropriations bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Grant-in-aid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2018-01-11 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-01-11 Amendment HA 3 to HB 260 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-01-11 Amendment HA 2 to HB 260 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-01-11 Amendment HA 1 to HB 260 - Stricken in House
2017-12-14 Amendment HA 3 to HB 260 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 260 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 260 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-23 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback