DE HB259 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

In 2006, Delaware enacted Jessicas Law, which requires first time offenders convicted of a specified sexual offense against a child under 14 years of age and individuals previously convicted of a Class A or B sexual offense in Title 11 and subsequently convicted of a specified sexual offense sentences be sentenced to at least 25 years in prison, up to life.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sentences For Sexual Offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Signed by Governor
2018-06-19 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-05 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-06-05 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2017-06-23 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback