DE HB257 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This substitute act establishes a Health Care Provider Loan Repayment Program for new primary care providers to be administered by the Delaware Health Care Commission. Under the loan repayment program, the Health Care Commission may award education loan repayment grants to new primary care providers of up to $50,000 per year for a maximum of 4 years. Priority consideration may be given to DIMER-participating students and participants in Delaware-based residency programs. Sites eligible to apply for grants on behalf of their new primary care providers must be located in underserved areas or areas of need and must accept Medicare and Medicaid participants. Grants to hospital sites must be matched on a dollar-for-dollar basis by the applicant hospital and the disbursement of grants from the program is contingent upon an initial, one-time contribution to the Health Care Provider Loan Repayment Program, in an amount Fiscal Year 21 appropriation of State funds up to a maximum of $1 million, from Delaware health insurers.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Health Care Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2020-01-24 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2020-01-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2020-01-16 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 257, and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |