DE HB255 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes the ability of state and school district employees to use the donated leave program to donate and accept annual leave and sick time for use by employees in connection with the birth or adoption of a child under the age of 6 years. An employee becomes eligible to receive such leave upon the birth of a child to the employee or employees spouse or upon adoption of a child younger than 6. Such an employee remains eligible for 6 months after such birth or adoption. The recipient may also use donated leave for a period of 1 year following the birth or adoption for absence related to maternal or pediatric medical appointments. Provided, however, that a recipient of donated leave must first use all of his or her accrued sick time and half of his or her annual leave. Where the recipient does not accrue annual leave, the recipient must have used all but 3 of that employees sick days prior to utilizing donated leave. All other established terms and conditions for donated leave remain the same.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 14 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Donated Leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 7 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2017-06-27 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 255 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 255 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-22 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-22 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback