DE HB255 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes the ability of state and school district employees to use the donated leave program to donate and accept annual leave and sick time for use by employees in connection with the birth or adoption of a child under the age of 6 years. An employee becomes eligible to receive such leave upon the birth of a child to the employee or employees spouse or upon adoption of a child younger than 6. Such an employee remains eligible for 6 months after such birth or adoption. The recipient may also use donated leave for a period of 1 year following the birth or adoption for absence related to maternal or pediatric medical appointments. Provided, however, that a recipient of donated leave must first use all of his or her accrued sick time and half of his or her annual leave. Where the recipient does not accrue annual leave, the recipient must have used all but 3 of that employees sick days prior to utilizing donated leave. All other established terms and conditions for donated leave remain the same.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 14 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Donated Leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 7 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-27 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2017-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 255 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 255 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-22 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |