DE HB254 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires all public schools that serve pupils in grades 7-12 that issue pupil identification cards to have printed on the identification cards the telephone or text numbers for the National Suicide Prevention and National Domestic Violence Hotlines and allows them to add the National Sexual Assault, Teen Dating Violence and Bullying Hotlines. The Act requires all public institutions of higher learning in Delaware, which issue student identification cards, to print on the student identification cards the telephone or text numbers for National Suicide Prevention, Domestic Violence Hotlines and local campus police or campus security telephone numbers and allows the institutions to add the National Sexual Assault Hotline number. This Act will be implemented for the 2022-2023 school year.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pupil And Student Identification Cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-03-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-03-17 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 254 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-16 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 254 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-01-27 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2022-01-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-01-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 7 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |