DE HB252 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 of this Act enhances the States ability to collect delinquent taxes by (a) allowing for renewal of a judgment for unpaid taxes beyond the current 20 year limit for an additional term of 20 years, and (b) allows for recording of a judgment for unpaid taxes in any county of the State. Section 2 makes it clear that this legislation is effective as of July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Related To Procedure, Administration And Enforcement Of Liability For Taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback