DE HB251 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill re-organizes and makes changes to Chapter 23 to be more reader-friendly and to clarify certain provisions regarding guardianship and permanent guardianship. It clarifies the circumstances under which a parent may not consent to guardianship, as well as the circumstances under which a guardianship may be rescinded interpreting the Delaware Supreme Court’s decision in Tourison v. Pepper, 51 A.3d 470 (Del. 2012). It also clarifies the standard under which the Family Court must determine competing guardianship petitions. The bill also makes changes as to who is eligible to serve as and petition for permanent guardianship of a child, and allows parents to petition for modification of permanent guardianship orders regarding contact, visitation or sharing of information. Finally, the bill makes some technical revisions to the chapter.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Pertaining To Guardianship Of A Child.
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Smith [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] |
Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |