DE HB246 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds the intentional touching of another person with semen to the definition of sexual contact. By doing so, the act of a person intentionally touching another person with semen without consent becomes the crime of unlawful sexual contact third degree.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sexual Offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-07-01 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-25 | Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2019-06-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |