DE HB246 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Joint Sunset Committee recommended in 2014 that the Board of Funeral Services and the Division of Professional Regulation review Chapter 31, Title 24 of the Delaware Code and submit proposed legislation to bring the law up to date with current funeral services standards and practices. As a result, the General Assembly passed and the Governor signed Senate Bill No. 65 in 2015. One of the provisions Senate Bill No. 65 added to the Delaware Code was 3106(e), which prohibited the collection or dissemination of “pricing materials from different funeral establishments or entities with the intent of steering potential clients based solely on the information collected” and deemed such collection or dissemination “the practice of funeral services.” This Act removes this provision, as it is unconstitutionally broad.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Relating To The Board Of Funeral Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |