DE HB245 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 245 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 245 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would require retail establishments to allow access to an employee bathroom for customers with Crohn’s disease, colitis, or other condition or device requiring immediate access to a restroom facility. A customer wishing access must have written documentation of the eligible medical condition from a medical professional or an identification card issued by a health organization or health department. The bill provides immunity from civil liability for any non-negligent injury occurring in a non-public area due to a customer request to use the employee restroom. The bill explicitly states that the new law would not require physical changes or facility improvements. Finally, a violation of the new chapter is punishable by a civil penalty of $100 for the first offense, and $200 for any subsequent offense.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Access To Private Bathrooms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 245 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 245 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 245 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 245 - Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-19 | House | HS 1 for HB 245 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-18 | House | HS 1 for HB 245 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 11 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | House | HS 1 for HB 245 - Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-03-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |