DE HB245 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act updates obsolete language and procedures, revises procedures to make the conduct of elections more effective and efficient, and removes conflicting provisions. The act includes several substantive changes. It would permit registered voters who have moved and not updated their addresses to vote at either their new or old election districts after updating their record. It authorizes the state election commissioner to develop procedures to streamline election day activities. It refines pre-election notice and advertising and thereby reduces advertising costs. It requires that minor party candidates be nominated at their party’s nominating convention and to report the resolutions nominating candidates to the state election commissioner or the respective Department of Elections. It increases the number of registered voters that a party must have to achieve ballot status. It gives the departments flexibility in designing ballots when there are insufficient columns to layout the ballot in its usual manner. It facilitates election day operations by giving the director and deputy director acting together the authority to correct errors in the motor voter process. The amendments to Section 5502 will make the statutory reasons for voting by absentee ballot in a general election consistent with the reasons established by ART. V, 4A of the Delaware Constitution.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-01-28 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-28 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-28 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-21 | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-01-12 | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate | |
2009-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-17 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |