DE HB244 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The development of portable storage units that may be placed upon an individual’s property has called into question whether these units are, in fact, “storage warehouses” and whether a constable may levy upon property located within. This legislation clarifies that portable storage containers are not storage warehouses and, therefore, the property located within is not exempt from levy and sale. It also eliminates the personal penalty directed to a constable who violates this section.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Levying Upon Goods In A Storage Warehouse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 Favorable |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |