DE HB243 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill prohibits law-enforcement agencies from releasing or publishing or causing to be released or published the name of any juvenile or any image depicting a juvenile, including displaying such image on any publicly maintained social media page or website, unless the juvenile is charged with a violent felony, and release or publication of the photograph is necessary to protect the publics safety.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Release And Publication Of The Name And Photograph Of A Juvenile.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-22 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 243 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-21 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 243 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |