DE HB243 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This bill is the direct result of the Delaware Financial Review of Volunteer Fire Companies Task Force Report of February 2017, created by House Concurrent Resolution 95 of the 148th General Assembly. The revised subsection (b) established in this Bill will provide the State Fire Prevention Commission with the authority to make sure that volunteer fire and ambulance companies properly complete their audit requirements and maintain fiscal responsibility. If a company fails to comply with audit requirements, the State Fire Prevention Commission can have the State Treasurer withhold Grant-in-Aid funds from the offending company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Volunteer Fire And Ambulance Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17 Signed by Governor
2018-03-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2018-01-23 Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2018-01-23 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-01-23 Amendment HA 1 to HB 243 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HB 243 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback