DE HB242 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Vapor products, commonly known as e-cigarettes or vape products, are increasing in popularity. This Act adds a definition of vapor products to Chapter 53, Title 30 (regarding Tobacco Product Tax), includes vapor products as a type of tobacco product, and makes other amendments to the Chapter to require those who deal in vapor products to obtain licenses just like those who deal in traditional tobacco products and to impose a tax on vapor products. This Act also increases the tax on tobacco products. Specifically, this Act does the following related to tobacco product and vapor product taxes:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Tobacco Product, Including Vapor Product, Taxation And Licensing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-03 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 11 NO 3 NOT VOTING
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 4 On Its Merits, 3 Unfavorable
2017-06-15 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback