DE HB242 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Vapor products, commonly known as e-cigarettes or vape products, are increasing in popularity. This Act adds a definition of vapor products to Chapter 53, Title 30 (regarding Tobacco Product Tax), includes vapor products as a type of tobacco product, and makes other amendments to the Chapter to require those who deal in vapor products to obtain licenses just like those who deal in traditional tobacco products and to impose a tax on vapor products. This Act also increases the tax on tobacco products. Specifically, this Act does the following related to tobacco product and vapor product taxes:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Tobacco Product, Including Vapor Product, Taxation And Licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] |
Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 11 NO 3 NOT VOTING | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 4 On Its Merits, 3 Unfavorable | |
2017-06-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |