DE HB241 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act increases the States alcoholic beverage tax rates. The rate for beer increases by 2¢ per 12 ounce can. The rate for wine increases by approximately 3¢ per 5 ounce serving. The rate for spirits containing more than 25% ethyl alcohol by volume increases by 15¢ per 750 ml bottle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapter 5, Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes On Alcoholic Beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-03 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 7 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 13 NO 2 NOT VOTING
2017-07-02 Amendment HA 1 to HB 241 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 3 On Its Merits, 5 Unfavorable
2017-06-21 Amendment HA 1 to HB 241 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-15 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback