DE HB241 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the States alcoholic beverage tax rates. The rate for beer increases by 2¢ per 12 ounce can. The rate for wine increases by approximately 3¢ per 5 ounce serving. The rate for spirits containing more than 25% ethyl alcohol by volume increases by 15¢ per 750 ml bottle.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 5, Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes On Alcoholic Beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] |
Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 7 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 13 NO 2 NOT VOTING | |
2017-07-02 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 241 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 3 On Its Merits, 5 Unfavorable | |
2017-06-21 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 241 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |