DE HB240 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates the Korey Thompson Student Emergency Housing Assistance Fund for the benefit of housing insecure undergraduate students at any college or university in Delaware and appropriates $90,000 to the Fund for FY2022. DSHA is charged with administering the Fund and reporting to the Governor and the General Assembly how the funds are spent.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Emergency Housing Assistance For College Students And Appropriating General Funds To The Student Emergency Housing Assistance Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-23 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-17 | Assigned to Housing Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |