DE HB240 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Defeated By House. Votes: 24 YES 17 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Sections 1 and 7 of this Act update from $400 to $800 the threshold which triggers the penalty for insufficient payment of estimated tax. The current threshold has been in place since 2000. Because it has not been modified in almost 20-years, the penalties generated as a result of this low threshold are often trivial amounts, which frustrate taxpayers. However, despite the penalties low dollar amounts, they still require significant resources to administer and resolve. Sections 1and 7 also provide for an inflation adjustment for the threshold ensuring that it will automatically keep pace with future economic trends.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes On Personal Income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Defeated By House. Votes: 24 YES 17 NO
2017-07-01 Amendment HA 5 to HB 240 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-07-01 Amendment HA 4 to HB 240 - Stricken in House
2017-07-01 Amendment HA 3 to HB 240 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote
2017-07-01 Amendment HA 2 to HB 240 - Stricken in House
2017-07-01 Amendment HA 1 to HB 240 - Stricken in House
2017-06-30 Amendment HA 5 to HB 240 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 4 to HB 240 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 240 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 3 to HB 240 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 240 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 7 On Its Merits, 4 Unfavorable
2017-06-15 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback