DE HB239 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]


This bill addresses how a vacancy in the office of New Castle County Executive will be filled. Initially the County Chief Administrative Officer will fill the position. Thereafter a special election shall be held to fill the vacancy for the balance of the term of office. This is the same special election process as applicable to a vacancy in a County Council district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Vacancy In The New Castle County Office Of County Executive.



2018-03-08 Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-24 Amendment HA 1 to HB 239 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources

Bill Comments