DE HB238 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Tabled in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act enables licensed veterinarians to exempt an animal from the mandated rabies vaccination, if the veterinarian determines the vaccine would endanger the animals health and a titer test has been administered to assist in determining the necessity of the vaccine. Additionally the bill requires that a license veterinarian complete a Vaccine Risk Assessment Form provided by the department and to review the form with the pet owner. The form must be developed and distributed to licensed veterinarians by the Department of Health and Social Services before January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 3 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rabies And Other Vaccination Requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09 Tabled in Committee
2018-04-24 Amendment HA 1 to HB 238 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-20 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback