DE HB238 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adopts by reference federal migratory game bird possession limits established by federal regulation to provide more efficient and timely adoption of such changing regulations. This bill also clarifies that possession limits do not apply to game birds, animals or fish that have been transported to a permanent residence and processed and stored for consumption, removes archaic and irrelevant language relative to rabbit and muskrat possession, and increases the currently outdated monetary fine for violation of this section.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Regulations And Prohibitions Concerning Wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |