DE HB237 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Currently, there are police officers in this State that are not covered by the Police Officers and Firefighters Employment Relations Act meaning that they do not possess the right of organization and representation. The purpose of this bill is to allow certain law enforcement officers, including supervisors, currently not covered by the Act to have the right of organization and representation. This bill only makes those officers not currently covered by the Act eligible to organize and be represented under the Act. The Act is not intended and should not be construed to affect the rights of any public employer, police officer, or firefighter already covered by the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Police Officers And Firefighters Employment Relations Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2021-06-22 Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2021-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-06-09 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback