DE HB237 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act eliminates the requirement that movie theaters selling alcohol have video cameras in each auditorium and the requirement that an employee must pass through each auditorium during a movie showing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Liquors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-23 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-01-22 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2020-01-21 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-15 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 5 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2019-06-18 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback