DE HB237 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill sets the premium tax rate for trust owned private placement life insurance contracts covering the life of an individual at 2% for the first $100,000 in premiums collected, with a premium tax rate of 0.0% for all premiums collected in excess of $100,000.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE & TELECOMMUNICATIONS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance & Telecommunications Committee in Senate |
2016-01-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |