DE HB235 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Act will prohibit political subdivisions of this State from requiring real estate licensees to obtain an additional business license or pay taxes in order to list property for sellers or represent buyers for the purchase of real estate.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Real Estate Services, Brokers, Associate Brokers, And Salespersons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2019-07-01 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 29 YES 9 NO 2 NOT VOTING | |
2019-06-30 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 235 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-30 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 235 - Stricken in House | |
2019-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 235 - Stricken in House | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |