DE HB235 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill encourages spaying, neutering, and vaccination in order to limit the number of unwanted cats and protect the public from rabies and other diseases carried by unvaccinated animals. The bill defines free-roaming cats and also free-roaming cat caretakers, who are one or more persons who may provide food, shelter, or medical treatment for free roaming cats without becoming an owner for legal purposes. These cats may be released back into the community with an ear-tip to mark them as a vaccinated and spayed/neutered. It also adds free-roaming cats to the list of qualifying factors for participation in the state low-cost spay/neuter fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 11 And 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sterilization, Life And Sustaining Care Of Cats.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-09 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2018-06-07 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
2018-06-07 Amendment HA 1 to HB 235 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-05 Amendment HA 1 to HB 235 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 12 On Its Merits
2017-06-15 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback