DE HB232 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Stricken in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is designed to centralize and modernize Delawares system for licensing its citizens to carry concealed deadly weapons. The current statutory scheme dates as far back as the Code Revision of 1974 and was not designed to handle the volume of applicants and licensees that are being experienced today, a volume that has at times unfairly overwhelmed both the Courts and the Office of the Attorney General.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 11 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Licensing Of Individuals To Carry Deadly Weapons Concealed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Stricken in House
2017-06-27 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback