DE HB231 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill creates an Abandoned Cultural Property Act. The act allows museums to establish title to property that has been donated or left with the museum after any loan period has terminated and the lender cannot be found.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Abandoned, Unclaimed, Or Unsolicited Cultural Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08 Signed by Governor
2018-01-25 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-24 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-01-24 Amendment SA 1 to HB 231 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-07-12 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback