DE HB230 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Recent high-profile attacks on judges and their families are a constant reminder to those that choose public service that they may be doing so at the risk of their and their loved ones lives. The death of U.S. District Court Judge Esther Salas son, Daniel Anderl, in New Jersey is tragically just one example numerous instances of threatening and harassing behavior targeted at judicial officers rarely make prime time news but nonetheless impacts them. The rise and use of social media and online access to information has made it more difficult for judicial officers to maintain their privacy. This Act would allow judicial officers to make a written request that their personal information not be published and remain confidential. The Act takes effect 1 year after its enactment to allow for implementation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Judicial Privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-23 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-06-22 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
2021-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HB 230 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2021-06-15 Amendment HA 1 to HB 230 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-09 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2021-06-03 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback