DE HB230 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill expands the population of war veterans who are eligible to be awarded a high school diploma.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State High School Diplomas For Veterans Who Served During Identified Period Of War Or Conflict.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 Favorable | |
2017-06-27 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |