DE HB23 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill will add a new check-off donation box on the Delaware personal income tax return whereby individuals may choose to donate a portion of their tax refund, or designate an amount in addition to the tax they owe that will be transferred by the Division of Revenue to the Pediatric Cancer Research Fund held by the Delaware Community Foundation, who in turn will deposit the funds to the Andrew McDonough B+ Foundation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Personal Income Tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-05-08 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2019-03-26 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2019-03-26 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-03-26 Amendment HA 2 to HB 23 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-03-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 23 - Stricken in House
2019-03-26 Amendment HA 2 to HB 23 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-03-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 23 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-01-23 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2019-01-04 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback