DE HB23 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-05 - Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires that any student over the age of 16 who wishes to leave school prior to graduation must obtain the written consent of the parent or guardian, and attend an exit interview where information is supplied regarding the likelihood of diminished earning potential and the increased likelihood of unemployment associated with dropping out. The school is also directed to explore whether there are support services, interventions or programs that might assist the student in remaining enrolled. The intent is to lower the dropout rate and encourage students to complete high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Attendance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-05 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
2017-01-25 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2017-03-15 Amendment HA 1 to HB 23 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-21 Amendment HA 1 to HB 23 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-03-21 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
2017-03-21 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-03-29 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-04-05 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2017-05-18 Signed by Governor

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback