DE HB229 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This bill concerns sick leave payout for retired State Troopers who became reemployed in public education. Specifically, this bill adds language to the code that would treat retired State Troopers the same as other educational employees as it relates to sick leave payment upon separation from educational employment.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Related To Unused Sick Leave Upon Separation Of Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-03 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-07-02 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 229 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-07-02 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 229 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 229 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |