DE HB229 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - HS 1 for HB 229 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - HS 1 for HB 229 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill prohibits the use of cell phones while operating a motor vehicle on the highways of the State of Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rules Of The Road.
Sponsors
Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Rep. Darryl Scott [D] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. D.P. Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | HS 1 for HB 229 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-22 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 5 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 19 YES 20 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-22 | Amendment HA 5 defeated | |
2010-06-17 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 5 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-06-15 | HS 1 for HB 229 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-15 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-15 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-15 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment SA 2 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 3 YES 18 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-15 | Amendment SA 2 defeated | |
2010-06-15 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-15 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment SA 1 to SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 7 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-15 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment SA 1 to SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-09 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-03 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2010-06-03 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2010-06-01 | HS 1 for HB 229 - Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 for HB 229 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 5 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 3 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 4 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 4 - Introduced in House | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 3 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2010-05-13 | HS 1 FOR HB 229 - Amendment HA 1 - Laid On Table in House | |
2010-03-17 | HS 1 for HB 229 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2010-03-17 | HS 1 for HB 229 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-02-18 | HS 1 for HB 229 - Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security | |
2010-02-18 | Substituted by HS 1 for HB 229 | |
2010-01-07 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits, 4 Unfavorable | |
2009-06-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |