DE HB228 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 of the bill amends Delawares file-and-use statute for insurance rate filings to extend the timeline for filing and reviewing insurers rate filing by (1) requiring rate filings to be filed at least 60 days in advance of the proposed effective date, and (2) authorizing the Commissioner to extend the timeframe to review the filing and postpone the effective date of the filing pending completion of the extended review. Section 2 of the bill sets forth the process for when the Commissioner proposes to deny a rate filing and requires that a filing may not become effective until a final order is issued. Section 2 of the bill also corrects technical errors in the current law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Rate Filings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-31 Signed by Governor
2023-06-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2023-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits
2023-06-21 Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate
2023-06-21 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2023-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2023-06-15 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback