DE HB228 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Kent County Tax Increment Financing Act to allow Kent County to determine the date as of which the adjusted assessed value and the original assessed value of the property in the TIF District designated by Kent County will be determined for the purposes of the Kent County Tax Increment Financing Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 54, Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Kent County Tax Increment Financing.
Sponsors
Rep. William Carson [D] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. William Outten [R] |
Rep. Lyndon Yearick [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |
2017-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |