DE HB228 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The intent of this bill is to make adjustments to the existing code to be consistent with current practices, clarify ambiguities, and eliminate sections that no longer apply.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Child Placement Review Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (CHILDREN; YOUTH & FAMILIES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Children; Youth & Families Committee in Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-04-03 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |