DE HB226 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing a fundamental economic change toward businesses that require innovation, The Honorable John C. Carney, Governor of the State of Delaware, issued Executive Order One on January 18, 2017 creating a Working Group of business and government leaders to study methods to improve coordination between the public and private sectors, attract growing businesses and foster economic development throughout the State. The Governor appointed members of the Working Group representing government, business leaders and the community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Delaware Code Relating To State Economic Development And Transferring The Functions Of The Delaware Economic Development Office To A Division Of The Department Of State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30 Signed by Governor
2017-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO
2017-06-22 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 ReAssigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
2017-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 3 to HB 226 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 2 to HB 226 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 226 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 226 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 ReAssigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2017-06-13 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback