DE HB225 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

This Bill is the Fiscal Year 2020 Appropriations Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Appropriations For The Expense Of The State Government For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2020; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Pertinent Statutory Provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Signed by Governor
2019-06-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
2019-06-25 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2019-06-25 Lifted From Table in Senate
2019-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 225 - Defeated By House. Votes: 4 YES 37 NO
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2019-06-18 Amendment HA 1 to HB 225 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-11 Introduced in House and Assigned to Appropriations Committee

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback