DE HB225 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 225 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 225 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
This Bill is the Fiscal Year 2016 Appropriation Act.
Title
An Act Making Appropriations For The Expense Of The State Government For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2016; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Pertinent Statutory Provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 225 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 225 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2015-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 225 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 30 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 225 - Amendment HA 1 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 12 YES 27 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-07-01 | House | Amendment HA 1 defeated |
2015-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 225 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2015-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 225 - Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2015-06-30 | House | HS 1 for HB 225 - Assigned to Appropriations |
2015-06-30 | House | Substituted by HS 1 for HB 225 |
2015-06-26 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House |