DE HB222 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows the State Board of Education to change or alter boundaries of reorganized school districts. It allows the State Board of Education to do so based upon redistricting recommendations from the newly formed Redding Consortium for Educational Equity ("Consortium"). It requires the Consortium to provide its recommendations through a transition, resource, and implementation plan for redistricting, the contents of which are specified in the Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Reorganization Of School Districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Nnamdi Chukwuocha [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Lockman [D] | Sen. Darius Brown [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] |
Sen. Laura Sturgeon [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 222 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 222 - Stricken in House | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 222 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 222 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |